MD SB364 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making the use or possession of less than 10 grams of marijuana a civil rather than a criminal offense; establishing that a person who violates the Act may be issued a citation; establishing fines; requiring a court to order a specified person who has committed a third or subsequent violation of the Act to appear in court and to attend a specified drug education program; requiring a court to refer the person for assessment for substance abuse disorder and to refer the person for substance abuse treatment if necessary; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - Civil Offense

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (78-55) (Y: 78 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Ready) {603728/1 Rejected (38-93) (Y: 38 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Impallaria) {793421/1 Rejected (40-89) (Y: 40 N: 89 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {713125/1 Rejected (42-87) (Y: 42 N: 87 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {343021/2 Rejected (54-78) (Y: 54 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Parrott) {323825/1 Rejected (45-87) (Y: 45 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Hough) {543821/1 Rejected (58-72) (Y: 58 N: 72 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-8) (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-8) (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Dyson) Rejected (21-22) (Y: 21 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158
2014-04-07SenatePassed Enrolled
2014-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (34-8)
2014-04-07SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2014-04-07SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2014-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (78-55)
2014-04-05HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
2014-04-05HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Ready) {603728/1 Rejected (38-93)
2014-04-05HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {793421/1 Rejected (40-89)
2014-04-05HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {713125/1 Rejected (42-87)
2014-04-05HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {343021/2 Rejected (54-78)
2014-04-05HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {323825/1 Rejected (45-87)
2014-04-05HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Hough) {543821/1 Rejected (58-72)
2014-04-05HouseFloor Committee Amendment {422317/1 Adopted
2014-04-05HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2014-04-05HouseFloor Committee Amendment {352611/2 Adopted
2014-04-05HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Mitchell) {463225/1 Withdrawn
2014-04-04HouseSpecial Order until 4/5 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
2014-04-04HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Mitchell) {463225/1
2014-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {692914/1 Report Adopted
2014-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2014-04-01HouseHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-14HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2014-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (36-8)
2014-03-14SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2014-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-12SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Shank) {313329/2 Adopted
2014-03-12SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Shank) {143625/3 Adopted
2014-03-11SenateLaid Over (Senator Getty) Adopted
2014-03-11SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Shank) {143625/3
2014-03-11SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-11SenateMotion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Dyson) Rejected (21-22)
2014-03-11SenateFavorable
2014-03-10SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-02-25SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-22SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0364&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0364f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0364t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0364e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_158_sb0364e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_14362503.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_31332902.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_69291401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_46322501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_35261102.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_32382501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_34302102.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_42231701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_54382101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_60372801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_71312501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0364_79342101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0364.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0364_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0364_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0364,s-0473&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0364,s-0564&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0364,s-1174&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0364,h-1223&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0364,h-1224&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0364,h-1225&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0364,h-1226&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0364,h-1227&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0364,h-1228&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0364,h-1229&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback