MD SB362 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the time that a local board of elections may begin opening absentee ballot envelopes to canvass the absentee ballots cast in an election to before 9 a.m. on the Friday following election day instead of prior to 8 a.m. on the Wednesday following election day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Timing of Canvass

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-25HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24HouseReferred Ways and Means
2020-02-21SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-02-19SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-02-19SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-02-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-29SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-24SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB555 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed (45-0)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law11302(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback