MD SB360 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Carroll County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $32,700,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in Carroll County, including water and sewer projects, to finance loans for fire or emergency-related equipment, buildings, and other facilities of volunteer fire departments in the County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2018-03-27SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-26HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2018-03-23HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-23HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-23HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2018-03-20HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
2018-03-19HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-20HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2018-02-15SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-02-13SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-13SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-12SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-02-07SenateHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback