MD SB360 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the requirement that the State Board of Education adopt and publish standards for the administration of a subsidized feeding program; requiring the State to be responsible for the student share of the costs of specified meals; prohibiting a county board from charging students eligible for a reduced price breakfast or lunch for any portion of the cost of a meal; altering the calculation for the reimbursement for specified meals to specified county boards of education; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (The Maryland Cares for Kids Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-5) (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-10HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2017-03-10SenateThird Reading Passed (41-5)
2017-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-07SenateSpecial Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2017-03-07SenateFavorable
2017-03-06SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2017-02-23SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2017-02-21SenateHearing canceled
2017-02-22SenateHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback