MD SB360 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that another planned permanent living arrangement may be a child's permanency plan only if the child is at least 16 years old.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Causes - Permanency Plans - Age Restrictions on Use of Another Planned Permanent Living Arrangement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381
2016-04-07SenatePassed Enrolled
2016-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2016-04-07SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2016-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (134-4)
2016-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {582716/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2016-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-17HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2016-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2016-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {848870/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-02-04SenateHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-28SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0360?ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0360f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0360t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0360e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_381_sb0360e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0360_84887001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0360_58271601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0360.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0360_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0360_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0360,s-0539&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0360,h-1001&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0360,s-1050&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback