MD SB360 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the procedures for preparing and adopting a budget for Calvert County; requiring each county department, agency, or board receiving county funds to submit a specified itemized budget request on or before a date set by the County Commissioners of Calvert County; requiring the County Commissioners to conduct a public hearing on a specified staff-recommended budget and a subsequent public hearing on the County Commissioners' budget; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calvert County - Budget Hearings and Procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162
2015-04-13SenateReturned Passed
2015-04-13HouseThird Reading Passed (137-1)
2015-04-13HouseHouse Recede
2015-04-13HouseMotion Recede (Delegate Barve) Adopted
2015-04-13SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2015-04-13SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2015-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2015-04-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-04-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {150018/1 Report Adopted
2015-04-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2015-03-24HouseHearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2015-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-03-10SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-03-10SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-03-09SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-02-24SenateHearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-06SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0360?ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0360f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0360t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_162_sb0360t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0360_15001801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0360.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0360_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0360_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0360,s-0334&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0360,h-1033&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0360,h-1143&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback