MD SB360 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from using or allowing a dog to be used for baiting; prohibiting a person from possessing, owning, selling, transporting, or training a dog with the intent to use the dog for baiting; and prohibiting a person from knowingly allowing specified premises to be used for baiting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Aggravated Animal Cruelty - Baiting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-09SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44
2013-04-01SenateReturned Passed
2013-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2013-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-03-28HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2013-03-27HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-21HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2013-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2013-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-03-19SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-12SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback