MD SB36 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of General Services and the Secretary of Transportation to cause the POW/MIA flag to be flown on the grounds of State buildings under their control whenever the flag of the United States is flown; requiring that the POW/MIA flag be flown from the State House as provided in a specified provision of law; defining the term "POW/MIA flag"; etc.
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Flags
General Services, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State House
Transportation, Department of
Flags
General Services, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State House
Transportation, Department of