MD SB36 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-30 - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-30 - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Frederick County to the list of counties in which specified nonprofit fraternal, religious, and war veterans' organizations may own and operate not more than five slot machines under specified circumstances.
Title
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2012-08-31 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Churches
Comptroller
Equipment
Fees
Frederick County
Gaming
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Records
Reports
Veterans
Churches
Comptroller
Equipment
Fees
Frederick County
Gaming
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Records
Reports
Veterans