MD SB36 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Dorchester County that an unpaid Bay Restoration Fee is a lien against the property served by the wastewater facility, onsite sewage disposal system, or holding tank; and requiring a notice of lien to be recorded in the land records of Dorchester County.
Title
Dorchester County - Bay Restoration Fee - Lien Against Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-1) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-22 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-04 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2010-03-03 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-26 | Special Order 3/1 (Senator Della) Adopted | |
2010-02-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-25 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-06 | (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs & Judicial Proceedings | |
2009-10-27 | Pre-filed |