MD SB359 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a scholarship for the student representative of the Carroll County Board of Education; specifying that a student may not receive more than two scholarships of $3,500 each; requiring the scholarship to be used for certain purposes and to be paid directly to a certain institution; providing that the scholarship may not be considered compensation for certain purposes; allowing the student representative to be reimbursed for certain expenses; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Carroll County
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students