MD SB359 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision prohibiting a court from entering a decree of divorce on the uncorroborated testimony of the party seeking the divorce; repealing a provision specifying that, in a suit for absolute divorce on the grounds of voluntary separation, a separation agreement is full corroboration of the plaintiff's testimony that the separation was voluntary under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Corroboration of Testimony
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-33) (Y: 101 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-33) (Y: 101 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-33) |
2016-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {382716/3 Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {458973/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |