MD SB358 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a local government, a billing authority for a water or wastewater facility, or any other authorized collection agency from imposing the Bay Restoration Fee on unimproved property.
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fee - Unimproved Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |