MD SB357 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of Trustees of the State Retirement and Pension System to appoint a physician who is a participating employee in the Optional Retirement Program to serve on a medical board subject to a specified condition; and prohibiting a medical board physician who is a participating employee in the Optional Retirement Program from participating in specified cases under specified circumstances.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Medical Board Participation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-01-31 | Hearing 2/9 at 9:00 a.m. | |
2012-01-30 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |