MD SB355 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB336
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that an individual meet certain educational and experiential requirements in order to be appointed or approved by a court as a custody evaluator; requiring that, beginning October 1, 2022, an individual complete 60 hours of initial training in certain areas in order to be appointed or approved by a court as a custody evaluator; requiring that an individual receive 10 hours of ongoing education and training every 2 years in order to continue to be appointed or approved by a court as a custody evaluator; etc.
Title
Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB355 (Carry Over) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Custody
Continuing Education
Counselors
Courts
Domestic Violence
Education
Family Law
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Sexual Offenses
Social Services
Social Workers
Substance Abuse
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor, and Employment
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Custody
Continuing Education
Counselors
Courts
Domestic Violence
Education
Family Law
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Sexual Offenses
Social Services
Social Workers
Substance Abuse
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 9 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0355?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0355f.pdf |