MD SB355 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Public Service Commission, when determining specified expenses while setting a just and reasonable rate for a gas company, to include all costs reasonably incurred by the gas company for performing environmental remediation of real property in response to a State or federal law, regulation, or order under specified conditions; authorizing that specified environmental remediation costs be included in a gas company's specified expenses regardless of specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (83-55) (Y: 83 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {153929/1 (Delegate Moon) Rejected (49-88) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-12) (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {153929/1 (Delegate Moon) Rejected (49-88) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-12) (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (83-55) |
2017-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment {153929/1 (Delegate Moon) Rejected (49-88) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-12) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted (33-13) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Prices
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Real Property
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Prices
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Real Property
Utilities
Utility Regulation