MD SB355 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-10)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the College Savings Plans of Maryland Board to establish the Maryland ABLE Program to help promote financial savings to support individuals with disabilities in maintaining health, independence, and quality of life; renaming the College Savings Plans of Maryland Board to be the Maryland 529 Board; requiring the Board to work in consultation with the Department of Disabilities regarding the Maryland ABLE Program; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-28 - House of Delegates - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-27SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2016-04-04SenateReturned Passed
2016-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2016-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-01HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2016-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-11HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2016-03-10SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2016-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {279435/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2016-02-24SenateHearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-28SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0355&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0355f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0355t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0355_27943501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0355.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0355_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0355_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/ag_letters/sb0355.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0355,s-0489&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0355,h-0974&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback