MD SB355 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Establishment of Specialized and Accelerated Educational Programs for Adult Learners; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; establishing the duties of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report, on or before December 1, 2014, to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Specialized and Accelerated Educational Programs for Adult Learners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset