MD SB354 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an individual to request aid in dying by making specified requests; prohibiting another individual from requesting aid in dying on behalf of an individual; requiring a written request for aid in dying to meet specified requirements; establishing specified requirements for witnesses to a written request for aid in dying; requiring a written request for aid in dying to be in a specified form; etc.
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Advance Medical Directives
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
Drugs
Evidence
Forms
Good Samaritan
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Privacy
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Public Health
Records
Signatures
Vital Records
Witnesses
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
Drugs
Evidence
Forms
Good Samaritan
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Privacy
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Public Health
Records
Signatures
Vital Records
Witnesses