MD SB353 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a requirement that annuity contracts purchased under the optional retirement program shall be issued to and become the property of participating employees of the program; clarifying that the rights of participating employees who purchase annuity contracts under the program are fully vested and not subject to forfeit; authorizing a participating employee in the optional retirement program to select specified annuity contracts for the transfer of existing balances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528
2017-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2017-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2017-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
2017-03-31HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-31HouseFavorable with Amendments {164563/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-31HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2017-03-23HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-10HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2017-03-09SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {489537/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2017-02-02SenateHearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m.
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0353&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0353f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0353t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0353e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_528_sb0353e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0353_48953701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0353_16456301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0353.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0353_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0353_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0353,s-0466&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0353,h-1066&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0353,s-1081&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback