MD SB352 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "interested party", for the purpose of certificate of need review of a replacement acute general hospital project, to include a jurisdiction within the region served by a specified regional health system that does not contain a specified hospital project.
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificate of Need Review - Interested Party
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | House | Delegates Sample-Hughes, K. Young, and Rose |
2016-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-11 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senators Hershey, Benson, and Reilly |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) |
2016-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {216988/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Counties
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Planning and Cost Review
Hospitals
Municipal Corporations
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Planning and Cost Review
Hospitals
Municipal Corporations