MD SB351 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-30 - Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-30 - Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting an exception to allow the State of Maryland to place a statue of Harriet Tubman in the National Statuary Hall Collection, or for the statue to otherwise be given specified prominence, in addition to specified existing Maryland representatives in the collection; and requesting the members of the Maryland congressional delegation to pursue this exception through the Joint Committee on the Library of Congress.
Title
Request to Place a Statue of Harriet Tubman in the National Statuary Hall
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] |
Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Congress, U.S
Federal Government
Governor
Historical Matters
Libraries
Monuments and Memorials
Public Buildings and Facilities
Committees and Commissions
Congress, U.S
Federal Government
Governor
Historical Matters
Libraries
Monuments and Memorials
Public Buildings and Facilities