MD SB350 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the authority of the Department of Natural Resources to establish Aquaculture Enterprise Zones and issue leases within those zones for shellfish aquaculture; authorizing the Department to issue enterprise leases under certain circumstances for the cultivation of native or naturalized species of aquatic plants; prohibiting the Department from issuing an enterprise lease for the cultivation of nonnative species; requiring an applicant for a lease to pay an application fee; establishing a maximum lease term of 5 years; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-07SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2021-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {780010/1 Adopted
2021-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-03-12HouseHearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-02HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2021-01-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-01-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-01-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {644331/1 Adopted
2021-01-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-05SenateHearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
2021-01-05SenateHearing canceled
2020-12-29SenateHearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-09-23SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources411A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources411A-05(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback