MD SB350 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Second Reading Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration and specified social service agencies to provide electronic records to the State Board of Elections regarding individuals who hold a driver's license or identification card, are at least 16 years of age, are citizens of the United States, and receive assistance from a social services agency; requiring the State Board to determine whether each individual whose electronic record it receives is eligible to be registered to vote and to provide specified information to local boards of elections; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Universal Voter Registration Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Rejected (21-24) (Y: 21 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateSecond Reading Failed
2016-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Rejected (21-24)
2016-04-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2016-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {424334/1
2016-04-06SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2016-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {424334/1
2016-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-02-18SenateHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-28SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback