MD SB350 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a licensed respiratory care practitioner has the right to practice respiratory care within the scope of practice of the respiratory care practitioner's license, including in a sleep laboratory; and providing that the licensing requirements to practice polysomnography do not apply to a respiratory care practitioner who was licensed by the State Board of Physicians on or before December 31, 2012, and whose duties include practicing polysomnography.
Title
Respiratory Care Practitioners - Practicing Polysomnography - Licensing
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-27 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-30 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |