MD SB35 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2021) - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2021) - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain limitation on the applicability of the Prevailing Wage Law to the construction of a public work for which 25%, rather than 50%, or more of the money used for construction is State money; altering the applicability of the Prevailing Wage Law to public work contracts by reducing the contract threshold amount from $500,000 to $250,000; applying the Act only to a public work contract executed on or after October 1, 2021; etc.
Title
Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Applicability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Overridden (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Overridden (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Overridden (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | House | Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2021) - Chapter 57 |
2021-04-10 | House | Overridden (96-42) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Overridden (32-15) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-39) |
2021-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {533794/1 Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Floor Amendment {983223/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Floor Amendment {373822/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {377475/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {377475/1 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB37 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-10 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2021) - Chapter 58
Subjects
Capital Budgets
Construction
Contracts
Procurement
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Construction
Contracts
Procurement
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |