MD SB348 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that an official need not disclose the acceptance of a ceremonial gift or award of insignificant monetary value on a financial disclosure statement; and providing that a regulated lobbyist need not allocate and report by name the individual recipients of ceremonial gifts and awards of insignificant monetary value on a lobbying activities report.
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB190 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 5 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |