MD SB348 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a specified individual to request that a State's Attorney certify that a conviction was made in error under specified circumstances; providing that an individual is eligible for a specified grant from the Board of Public Works if a State's Attorney has certified that the individual's conviction was made in error; establishing the Task Force to Study Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by December 15, 2017.
Title
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-51) (Y: 89 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-51) (Y: 89 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (89-51) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {222617/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {138071/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Governor
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Prisoners
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State's Attorneys
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Governor
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Prisoners
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State's Attorneys
Sunset