MD SB346 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person in Harford County to hunt deer on specified Sundays on private property using specified hunting equipment during specified months.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Approved by the Governor
2012-04-03 Third Reading Passed (112-7)
2012-04-02 Second Reading Passed
2012-04-02 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-04-07 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
2012-03-12 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-03-05 First Reading Environmental Matters
2012-04-03 Returned Passed
2012-03-02 Third Reading Passed (43-4)
2012-02-29 Second Reading Passed
2012-02-29 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-02-28 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2012-02-01 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-01-30 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback