MD SB341 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "school vehicle" to include specified vehicles that meet or comply with specified standards and requirements, were originally titled and used to transport children, students, and teachers in another state, comply with the regulations on transporting children enrolled in the federally funded Head Start Program, and are used only for transporting children to and from a Head Start program.
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-31 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Floor Amendment {593922/2 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {298075/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Child Care
Education
Interstate Affairs
Minors
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Primary and Secondary Education
School Buses
Students
Teachers
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Education
Interstate Affairs
Minors
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Primary and Secondary Education
School Buses
Students
Teachers
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous