MD SB340 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which an individual is not qualified to be a registered voter to include if the individual has been convicted of a certain violation of the election law and less than 4 years have elapsed since the date of the conviction; and providing that a person who is convicted of a certain violation of the election law is ineligible to vote for a period of 4 years after the date of the conviction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Offenses Related to Voting - Penalties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-02SenateHearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-10-28SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB694 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-28 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law16201(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback