MD SB340 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from stopping, standing, or parking a vehicle that is not a plug-in vehicle in a space that is marked for the use of plug-in vehicles and provides access to a plug-in vehicle recharging station; establishing that fines and penalties imposed for a specified violation must be distributed to the Transportation Trust Fund; requiring a plug-in vehicle located in a recharging space to be connected to the plug-in vehicle recharging station and to vacate the space once the plug-in vehicle is fully charged; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Brinkley) {813220/1 Adopted (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {683123/1 Rejected (Y: 11 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-02 Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
2012-03-15 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-03-13 First Reading Environmental Matters
2012-03-12 Third Reading Passed (36-10)
2012-03-08 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-08 Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) 813220/1 Adopted (34-10)
2012-03-08 Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) 123523/1 Adopted
2012-03-08 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) 683123/3 Withdrawn
2012-03-07 Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
2012-03-07 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) 683123/3
2012-03-07 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) 683123/1 Rejected (11-32)
2012-03-07 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-06 Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
2012-03-06 Favorable
2012-03-05 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2012-02-08 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-01-30 First Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback