MD SB34 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Physicians to license genetic counselors; providing that provisions of the Act do not limit the right of certain individuals to practice certain occupations; establishing the Genetic Counseling Advisory Committee within the Board; requiring individuals, on or after January 1, 2024, to be licensed by the Board as genetic counselors before practicing genetic counseling in the State; requiring the Board to issue a supervised genetic counselor license to certain applicants on or after January 1, 2024; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-02-24SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-02-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-23SenateFavorable with Amendments {164238/1 Adopted
2021-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-06SenateHearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-07-09SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB299 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations14-5G01(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G10(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G11(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G12(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G13(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G14(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G15(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G16(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G17(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G18(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G19(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G2(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G20(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G21(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G22(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G23(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G24(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G25(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G26(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G27(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G28(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G29(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G3(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G4(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G5(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G6(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G7(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G8(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations14-5G9(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback