MD SB34 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB712
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from using a scanning device to scan or swipe an individual's identification card or a driver's license to obtain personal information; prohibiting a person from retaining, selling, or transferring any information collected from scanning or swiping an individual's identification card or driver's license; providing that the Act does not prohibit a law enforcement officer from using a scanning device to record, retain, or transmit information if acting within the scope of the officer's official duties; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-08-10 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB34 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
HB752 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
HB752 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Funds Transfer
Equipment
Financial Institutions
Fraud
Identification
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Photography
Privacy
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Funds Transfer
Equipment
Financial Institutions
Fraud
Identification
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Photography
Privacy
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 1327 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |