MD SB338 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing to 200 feet the minimum distance from a place of worship, school, public library, or youth center for an establishment for which the Board of License Commissioners of Somerset County may issue a certain license.
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Community Facilities and Services
Libraries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Places of Worship
Private Schools
Public Schools
Somerset County
Youth
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Community Facilities and Services
Libraries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Places of Worship
Private Schools
Public Schools
Somerset County
Youth