MD SB337 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the Public Service Commission, after notice to customers and holding a public hearing and an evidentiary hearing, to authorize a certain rate consolidation of two or more water or sewage disposal systems if the systems have common ownership and the rate consolidation is in the public interest.
Title
Public Utilities - Water or Sewage Disposal Systems - Rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2018-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {897478/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |