MD SB337 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of specified funding for each participating regional resource center, the State Library Resource Center, and each county public library system for specified fiscal years.
Title
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-35) (Y: 103 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Kaiser) Adopted (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Kaiser) Adopted (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-35) |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (134-1) |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Libraries
Operating Budget
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Libraries
Operating Budget