MD SB334 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified definition for fiscal years 2017 and 2018 to determine the number of students used to calculate the State compensatory education grant for schools that participate in the federal community eligibility provision for school meals; requiring the State Department of Education, the Department of Budget and Management, and the Department of Legislative Services to submit a specified report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Title
The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-09 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-07 | House | Delegates M. Washington, Hornberger, and Ebersole |
2015-04-07 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-07 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, and Eckardt |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2015-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {135267/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {499235/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Food
Grants
Legislative Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
State Aid
Budget and Management, Department of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Food
Grants
Legislative Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
State Aid