MD SB334 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court to issue a permanent final protective order against an individual who is sentenced to serve, instead of who served, a term of imprisonment of at least 5 years for specified crimes and who has served at least 12 months of the sentence; adding the crime of assault in the second degree to the list of crimes, the commission of which subjects an individual to the issuance of a permanent final protective order against the individual under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {378373/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Assault
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Domestic Violence
Ex-Offenders
Family Law
Prisoners
Protection Orders
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Domestic Violence
Ex-Offenders
Family Law
Prisoners
Protection Orders