MD SB333 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the circumstances under which a police officer is required to charge by citation for certain misdemeanor or local ordinance violations that have an imprisonment penalty of up to 90 days; modifying the categories of offenses for which a police officer is authorized to charge by citation to include possession of a controlled dangerous substance other than marijuana; and modifying the circumstances under which a police officer may charge a defendant by citation.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsors
Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Obie Patterson [D] |
Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Sen. Chris West [R] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB261 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Citations
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Health
Injury
Law Enforcement
Warrants
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Health
Injury
Law Enforcement
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 4 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0333?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0333f.pdf |