MD SB333 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Limiting the types of beverages that a restaurant may include in the price of a children's menu of meal options or a meal that is represented as a child's meal; and authorizing a restaurant to offer specified beverages to minors for a charge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-18SenateHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-29SenateHearing cancelled
2016-02-11SenateHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-27SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback