MD SB333 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "transient charge", as it relates to Garrett County, for purposes of provisions of law authorizing specified counties to impose a hotel rental tax on transient charges collected by specified hotels; and increasing from 5% to 6% the maximum hotel rental tax rate that may be set in Garrett County.
Title
Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (102-34) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 175161/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-01 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-04-01 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-1) | |
2012-04-01 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2012-02-29 | Third Reading Passed (45-1) | |
2012-02-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Favorable with Amendments 699138/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |