MD SB332 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding prekindergarten services to specified 4-year-old children; establishing the Prekindergarten Expansion Grant Program; requiring the administration of the Program as a competitive grant program for specified providers; requiring a specified report on the aggregate estimated number of 3-year-old children and the subcategory that includes the estimated number of 3-year-old and 4-year old children from an economically disadvantaged background in each county in the State for the current school year and the next 5 school years; etc.
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-35) (Y: 103 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-35) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {695664/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {513428/1 Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {359232/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appropriations
Child Care
Children
Education
Education, State Department of
Grants
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Licenses
Minors
Names
Planning, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Students
Child Care
Children
Education
Education, State Department of
Grants
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Licenses
Minors
Names
Planning, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Students