MD SB332 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting the Family Security Trust Fund, under specified circumstances, from a requirement that specified interest accrue to the General Fund; and requiring the State Treasurer, under specified circumstances, to pay investment earnings into the General Fund of the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Security Trust Fund - Requirement to Transfer Interest to the General

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Approved by the Governor
2012-04-02 Third Reading Passed (118-13)
2012-04-01 Second Reading Passed
2012-04-01 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-04-05 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2012-03-26 Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-03-19 First Reading Health and Government Operations
2012-04-02 Returned Passed
2012-03-19 Third Reading Passed (45-0)
2012-03-17 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-17 Favorable with Amendments 669731/1 Report Adopted
2012-03-19 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2012-02-08 Hearing 2/15 at 1:15 p.m.
2012-02-08 Hearing cancelled
2012-02-01 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-01-27 First Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback