MD SB33 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a licensed home inspector from making certain certifications relating to pests as part of a residential rental inspection in Baltimore City unless the home inspector is certified as a pest control consultant, pest control applicator, or public agency applicator; prohibiting a licensed home inspector from making certain certifications relating to electrical systems as part of a residential rental inspection in Baltimore City unless the home inspector has completed 8 hours of certain training; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Home Inspectors - Residential Rental Inspections
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-33) (Y: 102 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 746 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-33) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {967976/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-10-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Baltimore City
Business Regulation and Occupations
Electricians
Housing
Inspections
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Pest Control
Real Estate
Real Property
Baltimore City
Business Regulation and Occupations
Electricians
Housing
Inspections
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Pest Control
Real Estate
Real Property