MD SB33 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide certain coverage for instruction by a licensed health care provider on fertility awareness-based methods; prohibiting the insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from applying a copayment, coinsurance requirement, or deductible to coverage for the instruction on fertility awareness-based methods, except with respect to a certain grandfathered exception; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-26HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-02-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {717471/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-01-31SenateHearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-10-24SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback