MD SB33 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time period during which the Commissioner of Financial Regulation must examine the business of specified mortgage lender licensees from at least once during any 36-month period to at least once during any 60-month period; and altering the minimum time period for which licensed mortgage lenders must retain specified records from 25 to 61 months.
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-10-03 | Senate | Pre-filed |