MD SB327 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing financial aid awarded by a public senior higher education institution to be reduced only under specified circumstances; authorizing financial aid awarded by a public senior higher education institution to be reduced up to a specified amount under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction Restrictions
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Young [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-2) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-2) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464432/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Higher Education
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition