MD SB327 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the distance that liquor stores in a specified legislative district in Baltimore City are required to be from places of worship or schools; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - 45th Legislative District - Liquor Stores - Premises Near
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Churches
Private Schools
Public Schools
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Churches
Private Schools
Public Schools