MD SB326 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a municipality to provide an individual who is filing a certificate of candidacy to become a candidate in a municipal election with proof of the time and date the certificate was filed.
Title
Municipal Elections - Certificates of Candidacy - Proof of Filing
Sponsors
Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Wayne Norman [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |